OK SB158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Disclosure of firearms; guidelines for physician inquiries regarding ownership of firearms; exclusions; penalties. Effective date.
Title
Disclosure of firearms; guidelines for physician inquiries regarding ownership of firearms; exclusions; penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)