OK SB1575 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; creating the Oklahoma Right to Shop Act; requiring health insurers to establish incentive program for certain services; requiring payment for out-of-network providers and facilities in certain conditions. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance; creating the Oklahoma Right to Shop Act; requiring health insurers to establish incentive program for certain services; requiring payment for out-of-network providers and facilities in certain conditions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |