OK SB1566 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; removing language creating a misdemeanor for making a false statement on certain affidavit to establish residency. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; removing language creating a misdemeanor for making a false statement on certain affidavit to establish residency. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Motion expired |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Seifried |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman (principal House author) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Seifried |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |