OK SB1551 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; amending various sections relating to the registration and weight restrictions of commercial vehicles. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; amending various sections relating to the registration and weight restrictions of commercial vehicles. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-14 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-10 | House | Amended |
2014-04-10 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Finance Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1133 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1134 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |