OK SB1548 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Self-Defense Act; deleting fee for certain course. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Self-Defense Act; deleting fee for certain course. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Shortey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |