OK SB1545 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bail; providing primary consideration for court making certain determination; establishing requirements for public safety reporting system. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Bail; providing primary consideration for court making certain determination; establishing requirements for public safety reporting system. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2022-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Emergency added |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |