OK SB1537 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; specifying information contained on certain permits. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; specifying information contained on certain permits. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-03 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-02 HAs adopted
2012-04-30 HAs read
2012-04-30 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-26 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 2
2012-04-26 General Order
2012-04-12 Title restored
2012-04-12 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-03-15 First Reading
2012-03-15 Engrossed to House
2012-03-14 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-14 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2012-03-14 Emergency added
2012-03-14 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2012-02-27 coauthored by Billy (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Title stricken
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Paddack
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714116New CodeSee Bill Text
4714124Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback