OK SB1529 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities; updating statutory language in the Oklahoma Municipal Power Authority Act. Effective date.
Title
Municipalities; updating statutory language in the Oklahoma Municipal Power Authority Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2022-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |