OK SB1515 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Medicaid False Claims Act; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Medicaid False Claims Act; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/11/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | General Order |
2016-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2016-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Kannady (principal House author) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 5053 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5053 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5053 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5053 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5053 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5053 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5053 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |