OK SB1512 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Appraiser fee schedule; allowing federal council to set certain fees for certain purpose. Emergency.
Title
Appraiser fee schedule; allowing federal council to set certain fees for certain purpose. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 25 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Ortega (principal House author) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |