OK SB1495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; establishing conditions under which certain property may not be resold at annual tax resale. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; establishing conditions under which certain property may not be resold at annual tax resale. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |