OK SB1480 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - SCs named David, Aldridge, Fields, Brinkley, Garrison, Ballenger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

County electrical inspectors; modifying qualification requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County electrical inspectors; modifying qualification requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 40 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 SCs named David, Aldridge, Fields, Brinkley, Garrison, Ballenger
2012-05-07 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation
2012-05-01 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-24 HAs read
2012-04-24 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-23 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-23 Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31; Ayes: 40 Nays: 36
2012-04-23 General Order
2012-04-05 Enacting clause stricken
2012-04-05 CR; Do Pass, as amended, General Government Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-03-08 First Reading
2012-03-08 Engrossed to House
2012-03-07 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-07 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2012-03-07 General Order, Considered
2012-02-28 coauthored by Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2012-02-28 Title stricken
2012-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator David
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1986338New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback