OK SB1455 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
Pending: House Administrative Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
Pending: House Administrative Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative Procedures Act; establishing guidelines for interpretation of statutes or administrative rules. Effective date.
Title
Administrative Procedures Act; establishing guidelines for interpretation of statutes or administrative rules. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |