OK SB145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB145
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Merit Protection; creating the Task Force on Merit Protection. Effective date.
Title
Merit Protection; creating the Task Force on Merit Protection. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB145 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee