OK SB1433 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicles; providing for certain multiplier for overweight fines and penalties. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Motor Vehicles; providing for certain multiplier for overweight fines and penalties. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-03-08 | Senate | coauthored by Leewright (principal House author) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |