OK SB1432 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Human trafficking; providing for civil actions and costs; modifying when certain statute of limitations shall commence. Effective date.
Title
Human trafficking; providing for civil actions and costs; modifying when certain statute of limitations shall commence. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 748 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 238 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 238 | 6B | New Code | See Bill Text |