OK SB1428 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development; creating an investment rebate program for certain entity; providing procedures; creating the Commerce Manufacturing Activity Development Fund.
Title
Economic development; creating an investment rebate program for certain entity; providing procedures; creating the Commerce Manufacturing Activity Development Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alvord |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |