OK SB1399 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Students; authorizing the State Department of Education to approve vision screeners to conduct certain screenings. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Students; authorizing the State Department of Education to approve vision screeners to conduct certain screenings. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |