OK SB1381 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Agency director qualifications; modifying certain requirements relating to education and experience. Effective date.
Title
Agency director qualifications; modifying certain requirements relating to education and experience. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2016-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Hall (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |