OK SB1375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Office of Juvenile Affairs; authorizing Board to administer charter school; directing Office to initiate requests for proposals for certain facility. Emergency.
Title
Office of Juvenile Affairs; authorizing Board to administer charter school; directing Office to initiate requests for proposals for certain facility. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Emergency added |
2014-04-02 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paddack |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |