OK SB1372 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 04/25/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 04/25/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aeronautics technology; creating the Oklahoma Aircraft Engine Testing Development Grant Program; creating revolving fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Aeronautics technology; creating the Oklahoma Aircraft Engine Testing Development Grant Program; creating revolving fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Becomes law without Governor's signature 04/25/2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2024-04-17 | House | General Order |
2024-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Haste |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |