OK SB1351 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Officers; relating to the Oklahoma Open Meetings Act; adding exemption the Oklahoma Film and Music Office.
Title
Officers; relating to the Oklahoma Open Meetings Act; adding exemption the Oklahoma Film and Music Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: International Relations & Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: International Relations & Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-12 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2010-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 27; Ayes: 61 Nays: 33 | |
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, DeWitt | |
2010-04-12 | Remove Representative DeWitt as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hickman | |
2010-04-12 | General Order | |
2010-03-30 | CR; Do Pass International Relations and Tourism Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to International Relations and Tourism | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 | |
2010-02-23 | coauthored by Hickman | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2010-02-03 | coauthored by DeWitt (principal House author) | |
2010-02-03 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-03 | Pending authorship Representative(s) DeWitt | |
2010-02-02 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |