OK SB1340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; creating the Kennel Definitions Act. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; creating the Kennel Definitions Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-24 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Pruett (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2010-02-16 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2010-02-03 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Pruett | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Ellis | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 1960 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1960 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |