OK SB1337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Medicaid program; directing Health Care Authority to enter into capitated contracts to transform Medicaid delivery system for certain Medicaid populations; modifying various provisions of the Ensuring Access to Medicaid Act; repealers. Effective date. Emergency. Conditional effect.
Title
State Medicaid program; directing Health Care Authority to enter into capitated contracts to transform Medicaid delivery system for certain Medicaid populations; modifying various provisions of the Ensuring Access to Medicaid Act; repealers. Effective date. Emergency. Conditional effect.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] |
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Haste |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named McCortney, Rosino, Haste, Garvin, Montgomery, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Randleman |
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 9 |
2022-04-28 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-28 | House | Title restored |
2022-04-28 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-04-28 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-21 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-21 | House | Emergency added |
2022-04-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-04-04 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |