OK SB1336 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; modifying hours during which certain beverages may be sold. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; modifying hours during which certain beverages may be sold. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 4 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37A | 3 | 125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 4 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |