OK SB1331 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Water and water rights; creating the Water and Wastewater Infrastructure Investment Program; rescission of funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Water and water rights; creating the Water and Wastewater Infrastructure Investment Program; rescission of funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Maynard (principal House author) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |