OK SB1325 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - coauthored by Newell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - coauthored by Newell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Charter schools; removing language prohibiting charter schools from offering curriculum for deaf or blind students. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Charter schools; removing language prohibiting charter schools from offering curriculum for deaf or blind students. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Newell (principal House author) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |