OK SB132 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State licenses; authorizing licensing authority to withhold renewal of license upon notice of non-compliance with income tax laws. Effective date.
Title
State licenses; authorizing licensing authority to withhold renewal of license upon notice of non-compliance with income tax laws. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-13 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |