OK SB1298 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Child custody; requiring certain written findings; clarifying right of appeal. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child custody; requiring certain written findings; clarifying right of appeal. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2018-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-02-13SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Pemberton
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431111New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback