OK SB1297 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Campus security; allowing private schools to establish a police department. Effective date.
Title
Campus security; allowing private schools to establish a police department. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 360 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 360 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |