OK SB1296 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying investment of certain prepaid funeral service funds. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying investment of certain prepaid funeral service funds. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 4 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11 |
2018-04-12 | House | General Order |
2018-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 3 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |