OK SB1281 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative fuels; modifying certain annual fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Alternative fuels; modifying certain annual fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |