OK SB1266 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - Failed in Committee - Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - Failed in Committee - Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to income tax; limiting time period during which a deduction may be claimed for a contribution to a political party or a candidate. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to income tax; limiting time period during which a deduction may be claimed for a contribution to a political party or a candidate. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Failed in Committee - Finance | |
2010-02-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1266&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb1266_int.rtf |