OK SB1264 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - SCs named GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - SCs named GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring school districts to submit certain expenditure statements. Effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring school districts to submit certain expenditure statements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 31 |
2016-04-19 | House | General Order |
2016-04-07 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |