OK SB1264 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; allowing for post office box on driver license. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; allowing for post office box on driver license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan | |
2010-04-15 | General Order | |
2010-03-25 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Motion expired | |
2010-03-02 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Branan | |
2010-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 | |
2010-03-02 | Title restored | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Ritze (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Barrington | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Ritze | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Barrington | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |