OK SB1259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Coauthored by Senator Murdock
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Coauthored by Senator Murdock
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; establishing authority to approve or disapprove de-annexation. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; establishing authority to approve or disapprove de-annexation. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cockroft (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |