OK SB1251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; prohibiting health insurance plans from taking certain actions; prohibiting domestic abuse being considered a preexisting condition. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; prohibiting health insurance plans from taking certain actions; prohibiting domestic abuse being considered a preexisting condition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Sen. Kenneth Corn [D] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] |
Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Debbe Leftwich [D] | Rep. Danny Morgan [D] | Sen. Andrew Rice [D] |
Sen. Jim Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | coauthored by Rice | |
2010-05-28 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-26 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Collins, Billy | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2010-04-22 | General Order | |
2010-04-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morgan | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-10 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance), Gumm, Leftwich, Corn | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Brown (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Brown | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Wilson | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6060 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6060 | 10A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |