OK SB1239 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
War Veterans Commission Revolving Fund; updating language. Emergency.
Title
War Veterans Commission Revolving Fund; updating language. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Health and Social Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Health and Social Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | House | Emergency added |
2014-04-22 | House | Amended |
2014-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Hardin (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |