OK SB1214 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System; making technical corrections to bring the System into compliance with IRS laws and regulations. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System; making technical corrections to bring the System into compliance with IRS laws and regulations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 46 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 46 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 | |
2012-04-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-04-05 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-28 | First Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-02-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-27 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-27 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-16 | coauthored by Moore (principal House author) | |
2012-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 50 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 50 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 50 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |