OK SB1201 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health information; requiring health care entities to utilize statewide health information exchange. Effective date.
Title
Health information; requiring health care entities to utilize statewide health information exchange. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |