OK SB1182 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Governor; updating obsolete language; repealing obsolete statutes.
Title
Governor; updating obsolete language; repealing obsolete statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 5 |
2016-04-18 | House | General Order |
2016-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Cleveland (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |