OK SB1181 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Limitation of Liability for Farming and Ranching Land Act; removing per acre charge limitation. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Limitation of Liability for Farming and Ranching Land Act; removing per acre charge limitation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |