OK SB1177 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Size, Weight and Load; providing weight exemption for natural gas vehicle. Effective date.
Title
Size, Weight and Load; providing weight exemption for natural gas vehicle. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |