OK SB116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private prison facilities; making certain requirements inapplicable to contactors that house federal inmates. Emergency.
Title
Private prison facilities; making certain requirements inapplicable to contactors that house federal inmates. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2015 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | coauthored by Jech |
2015-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 10; Ayes: 70 Nays: 11 |
2015-04-20 | House | Amended |
2015-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fisher |
2015-04-20 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | Emergency added |
2015-04-08 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-30 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Peterson and substitute with Representative Echols |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 563 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 563 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |