OK SB1156 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - CR; Do not pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - CR; Do not pass Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; repealing law relating to limitations on subrogation and setoff under medical coverage. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; repealing law relating to limitations on subrogation and setoff under medical coverage. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO NOT PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | CR; Do not pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 | |
2012-03-13 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Faught (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |