OK SB1155 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Damages; providing penalties for damaging or tampering with vehicles or implements of husbandry. Effective date.
Title
Damages; providing penalties for damaging or tampering with vehicles or implements of husbandry. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Steve) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1155&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb1155_int.rtf |