OK SB1144 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating the Automatic License Plate Reader Privacy Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating the Automatic License Plate Reader Privacy Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26SenateTitle restored
2016-05-26SenateCCR read
2016-04-28HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2016-04-27SenateSCs named Dahm, Barrington, David, Brooks, Shaw, Paddack, Bass
2016-04-25SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2016-04-18SenateHAs read
2016-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 27
2016-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2016-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-03-31HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2016-03-16HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2016-03-16HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2016-03-10SenateTitle stricken
2016-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2016-02-08Senatecoauthored by Walker (principal House author)
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47113910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
47113911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711396Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711398Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711399Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1144&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1144%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1144%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB1144%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB1144%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1144%20SUBREC.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1144%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB1144%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1144%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB1144%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB1144_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB1144_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback