OK SB1131 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Right-of-Way; authorizing right-of-way use for certain purpose. Requiring certain permission and standards. Effective date.
Title
Highway Right-of-Way; authorizing right-of-way use for certain purpose. Requiring certain permission and standards. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Motion expired |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Crain |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 22 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by Joyner (principal House author) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |