OK SB1128 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pensions; creating the Pension Improvement Act; creating the Pensions Improvement Revolving Fund.
Title
Pensions; creating the Pension Improvement Act; creating the Pensions Improvement Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 23 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2016-04-18 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 23 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2016-04-18 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Motion expired |
2016-04-18 | House | Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 23 |
2016-04-18 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Thomsen |
2016-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 16 |
2016-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker |
2016-04-18 | House | General Order |
2016-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2016-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Pensions committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |