OK SB1127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vulnerable adults; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Vulnerable adults; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Long-Term Care and Senior Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Long-Term Care and Senior Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/11/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-04-04 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Munson (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |